ASPEKT Praha, spol. s ro, IČO: (61855243), extract from the registers of companies and self-employed persons
Basic information
Name: | ASPEKT Praha, spol. s.r.o |
---|---|
Residence: | Prague |
ID number: | 61855243 |
Statement of data for ASPEKT Praha, spol. s ro from the register of economic entities
Basic data of ASPEKT Praha, spol. s.r.o
ID number: | 61855243 |
---|---|
Firm: | ASPEKT Praha, spol. s.r.o |
Legal form: | Limited liability company |
district: | Prague |
Basic territorial unit: | Prague 10 |
Number of employees: | 1 – 5 employees |
Institutional sector: | National private non-financial enterprises |
Creation date: | 16/09/1994 |
Headquarters of ASPEKT Praha, spol. s.r.o
Fields of activity NACE according to RES (Register of economic subjects)
Wholesale brokerage and wholesale by proxy |
Intermediation of non-specialized wholesale and non-specialized wholesale on behalf |
Statement of data for ASPEKT Praha, spol. s ro from the trade register
Basic data of ASPEKT Praha, spol. s.r.o
IČO (identification number): |
61855243 |
---|---|
name: |
ASPEKT Praha, spol. s.r.o |
Legal form of business: |
Limited liability company |
Creation of the first business: |
16/09/1994 |
Total number of businesses: |
4 |
Active businesses: |
1 |
Headquarters of ASPEKT Praha, spol. s.r.o
Residence: |
Omská 1020/45, Prague 10000 |
---|
Activities ASPEKT Praha, spol. s.r.o
Trade No. 1 Production, trade and services not listed in Appendices 1 to 3 of the Trade Act
Fields of Activity |
|
---|---|
Type of trade | free trade |
Business status | active |
Creation of authorization | 16/09/1994 |
Statutory body ASPEKT Praha, spol. s.r.o
Statement of data for ASPEKT Praha, spol. s ro from the commercial register
Basic data of ASPEKT Praha, spol. s.r.o
court: | Municipal Court in Prague | 16/09/1994 |
---|---|---|
Spiš brand: | C 31503 | |
IČO (personal identification number): | 61855243 | |
name: | ASPEKT Praha, spol. s.r.o | |
Legal form: | Limited liability company |
16/09/1994 |
Registered on: | 16/09/1994 | |
The business corporation submitted to the law as a whole in accordance with § 777 paragraph 5 of Act No. 90/2012 Coll., on business companies and cooperatives. | 27/06/2014 | |
Number of members of the statutory body: 3 | 27/06/2014 – 10/11/2016 | |
Date of conclusion of partnership agreement: 10.6.1994 | 16/09/1994 |
Capital ASPEKT Praha, spol. s.r.o
Basic capital |
200,000 CZK |
|
---|---|---|
Paid off | – | |
Valid from – to | 16/09/1994 |
Headquarters of ASPEKT Praha, spol. s.r.o
Validity of data from – to | ||
Address: |
Omská 1020/45, Prague 10 10000, Czech Republic |
25/03/2008 |
---|---|---|
Address: |
U Nový vil 941/24, Prague 10 10000, Czech Republic |
16/09/1994 – 25/03/2008 |
Subject of business ASPEKT Praha, spol. s.r.o
Validity of data from – to | |
---|---|
Production, trade and services not listed in Appendices 1 to 3 of the Trade Act | 10.3.2010 |
Purchase of goods for the purpose of their further sale and sale with the goods listed in annex 2-3 item no. 455/91 Coll. | 16/09/1994 – 10.3.2010 |
Intermediary activity in the field of trade. | 16/09/1994 – 10.3.2010 |
Management of ASPEKT Praha, spol. s.r.o
Statutory body ASPEKT Praha, spol. s.r.o
executive | Timur Zhakelekov |
---|---|
In function | from 12/04/2010 |
Address | Alma-Ata, Tulebayeva 162 |
Executive | Ing. became the chairman. Josef Vokroj |
---|---|
In function | from 27/06/2014 |
Address | On the hills 2348/16, 10000 Prague |
Executive | Ing. Vítězslav Norek |
---|---|
In function | from 27/06/2014 |
Address | Janouchova 657/7, 14900 Prague |
executive | Saule Zhangabylova |
---|---|
In function | from 10/11/2016 |
Address | Omská 1508/43, 10000 Prague |
executive | Timur Zhakelekov |
---|---|
In function | from 20/02/2017 |
Address | Omská 1508/43, 10000 Prague |
executive | Saule Zhangabylova |
---|---|
In function | from 2/21/2018 |
Address | Pod vrstevnicí 494/8, 14000 Prague |
executive | Saule Zhangabylova |
---|---|
In function |
from 10/11/2016 do 2/21/2018 |
Address | Omská 1508/43, 10000 Prague |
executive | Timur Zhakelekov |
---|---|
In function |
from 12/04/2010 do 20/02/2017 |
Address | Alma-Ata, Tulebayeva 162 |
Executive | Ing. became the chairman. Josef Vokroj |
---|---|
In function |
from 27/06/2014 do 20/02/2017 |
Address | On the hills 2348/16, 10000 Prague |
Executive | Ing. Vítězslav Norek |
---|---|
In function |
from 27/06/2014 do 20/02/2017 |
Address | Janouchova 657/7, 14900 Prague |
Executive | Ing. became the chairman. Josef Vokroj |
---|---|
In function |
from 25/03/2008 do 27/06/2014 |
Address | Na vrích 16, 10000 Prague 10 |
Executive | Ing. became the chairman. Vítězslav Norek |
---|---|
In function |
from 25/03/2008 do 27/06/2014 |
Address | Janouchova 657, 14900 Prague 4 |
Executive | Ing. became the chairman. Josef Vokroj |
---|---|
In function |
from 16/09/1994 do 25/03/2008 |
Address | Na Vrších 16, Prague 10 |
Executive | Ing. became the chairman. Vítězslav Norek |
---|---|
In function |
from 16/09/1994 do 25/03/2008 |
Address | Janouchova 657, Prague 4 |
All the data that we display in our register about companies and self-employed people comes from publicly available registers. Where it belongs Business Register, Trade Register AND Register economic entities operated by the Statistical Office.
We continuously update the data from the source registers. If you find incorrect or inaccurate information in our register, please make this information available to us at [email protected]. If you have reservations about the processing of your personal data in our register, contact us via email [email protected].