24RHINE
1. FC Cologne
Created: 12/13/2022, 7:33 p.m
Since the founding of 1. FC Köln, the billy goats have had a total of ten presidents. The presidents from Franz Kremer to Werner Wolf at a glance.
1/10 The first president of 1. FC Köln was Franz Kremer (February 13, 1948 to November 11, 1967). He was the driving force behind the merger of his former club Kölner BC 1901 and Spielvereinigung Sülz 07. (Photo: July 8th, 1956) © Sportfotodienst/Imago
2 / 10 Werner Müller was the second president at 1. FC Köln (November 12, 1967 to August 8, 1968). After Frank Kremer’s death, he took over his post. Müller held the post for just under a year. (Photo: March 30, 1968) © Sportfotodienst/Imago
3/10 Oskar Maass was the third president of 1. FC Köln (9 August 1968 to 12 October 1973). During his time as president, the old Müngersdorfer stadium was demolished and rebuilt. (Photo: July 29, 1968) © HORSTMÜLLER/Imago
4/10 With Peter Weiand as president (October 12, 1973 to April 3, 1987), 1. FC Köln celebrated one of the most successful seasons in the club’s history. In 1978 the billy goats got the double. During his tenure, the Cologne team were also able to win two more DFB cups. (Photo: December 16, 1986) © Sportfotodienst/Imago
5/10 Dietmar Artzinger-Bolten was the fifth FC President (April 3, 1987 to November 21, 1991). In his four-year tenure, the billy goats were twice runners-up. (Photo: 08/27/1988) © pmk/Imago
6/10 Klaus Hartmann was the sixth FC President (November 21, 1991 to December 4, 1997). His era stands for the economic and sporting decline of 1. FC Köln. Here he says goodbye to Pierre Littbarski. (Photo: May 4th, 1993) © Sportfotodienst/Imago
7/10 The seventh FC President was Albert Caspers (December 4, 1997 to May 7, 2004). He consolidated the debts of 1. FC Köln, but there was no sporting success in his era. (Photo: August 16, 1998) © Sportfotodienst/Imago
8/10 Wolfgang Overath was the seventh president of 1. FC Köln (June 14, 2004 to November 13, 2011). In his active time as a player, he was in over 400 league games for the billy goats on the lawn, became champion and cup winner with the Cologne team. In 1974 he was crowned world champion with the national team. (Photo: June 14, 2004) © Kosecki/Imago
9/10 Werner Spinner was the ninth president of 1. FC Köln (April 23, 2012 to March 11, 2019). After power struggles with sports director Armin Veh, he resigned in 2019. (Photo: May 5th, 2012) © Sportfotodienst/Imago
10/10 Werner Wolf is currently President of 1. FC Köln. He took office on September 8, 2019. He has been a member of the FC family since 2003. In 2011 he was elected President of the FC Board of Directors. (Photo: September 11, 2022) © Ralf Treese/Imago
Cologne – From 1948 to the present day, ten presidents have guided the fortunes of the 1. FC Cologne . Werner Müller, who was FC President for only nine months, had the shortest term in office. With over 18 years of age Franz Kremer the longest tenure. is current dr Werner Wolf the president of 1. FC Köln.
Also interesting