Municipal council replacement bank: Who is all sworn into the municipal council and where can you run for office?
The Innsbruck municipal council consists of 40 women and men. Not every municipal councilor can always be present at the meetings. That’s why there are substitute municipal councils. Do you know who is sworn into the Innsbruck municipal council? And who can run where?
INNSBRUCK. In May 2018, Georg Willi was sworn in as mayor. With him also the other women and men who sit on the seats of the municipal council. “We are all city,” explained Willi at the swearing-in ceremony.
“I pledge to faithfully follow the state and federal constitutions as well as the other laws of the state of Tyrol and the federal government, to promote the well-being of the city to the best of my knowledge and ability, and to exercise my office impartially and selflessly.”
This is the official oath in § 12 of the Innsbruck city law. A sentence that has often been spoken by the municipal council since May 2018.
initial position
In the municipal council elections in 2018, Georg Willi was elected mayor in a direct election. His opponent was the then mayor Christine Oppitz-Plörer. In the run-off election, the turnout was 43.74 percent, Willi received 52.9 percent of the votes. The voter turnout for the municipal election was 50.38 percent. Percentage of votes: ÖVP 12.17%, FI 16.15%, GREEN 24.16%, SPÖ 10.32%, FPÖ 18.56%, PIRATE 0.39%, TSB 2.72%, JUST 3.10%, ALI 2.38%, BI 2.08%, FRITZ 3.23% and NEOS 4.73%. In the municipal council, this means the Greens have 10 seats, FPÖ 7, FI 7, ÖVP 5, SPÖ 4, NEOS 2, List Fritz 1, Just Innsbruck 1, Tyrolean Senior Citizens’ Association 1 (coupled with ÖVP) and ALI 1.
The bench
Forty selected municipal councilors are currently faced with 51 substitute municipal councillors. Including state councilor Gabi Fischer or state parliamentarians Evelyn Achhorner, Markus Abwerzger and Gebi Mair.
Both greens were following twelve People sworn in: June 14, 2018 (Municipal Council meeting): Thomas Schultze, September 17, 2018: Sarah Schett, December 14, 2018: Manfred Roner, December 14, 2018: Raphael Lepuschitz, February 28, 2019: Bénédicte Walczak, February 28, 2019: Thomas Carli, February 28. 2019: Angelika Hörmann, November 22, 2019: Andreas Pichler, April 22, 2021: Gabrielle Fischer, May 19, 2022: Lea Hetfleisch, July 14, 2022: Gebi Mair and July 14, 2022: Manfred Kienpointner.
In the FPÖ Innsbruck – List Rudi Federspiel became nine persons sworn. July 12, 2018: Markus Abwerzger, July 12, 2018: Stefan Leiner, July 12, 2018: Maria-Magdalena Trinkl, September 17, 2018: Beatrix Klaus, December 13, 2018: Hiltrud Berauer, June 19, 2019: Evelyn Achhorner, July 18, 2019: Ricardo Vista , July 23, 2021: Egon Vones and October 27, 2021: Mario Fauster.
For the list “For Innsbruck” became nine women and men sworn in. June 14, 2018: Gerda Springer, July 18, 2019: Franz Abenthum, July 18, 2019: Georg Kößler, July 19, 2019: Antonella Placheta, July 19, 2019: Christian Höck, July 19, 2019: Carmen Lorenz Carmen, August 21, 2020: Werner Degler, July 23, 2021: Hansi Berchtold Jr., October 13, 2021: Norbert Ried.
In the ÖVP Innsbruck became five persons sworn. September 17, 2018: Christoph Appler, December 14, 2018: Dominik Berloffa, May 29, 2019: Daria Sprenger, July 18, 2019: Peter Pock and July 23, 2021: Helga Peintner.
die SPÖ Innsbruck cap five Women and men nominated as substitute municipal councillors. July 12, 2018: Martin Kuprian, October 11, 2018: Christina Bielowski, January 29, 2020: Stefan Gasser, April 22, 2021: Reini Happ and May 19, 2022: Dennis Mimm.
Both NEOS (1) Stefan Gleinser was sworn in as a municipal councilor on May 29, 2019.
die List Fritz (2) sent Daniel Holzer on September 17, 2018 and Stefan Eller on April 20, 2022 to be sworn in.
die List Legal Innsbruck cap three Substitute councillors. September 17, 2018: Georg Angermair, October 11, 2018: Philipp Zass and March 18, 2021: Felix Putz.
At the Tyrolean Senior Citizens Association (2) Hanns Christian Forcher-Mayr was sworn in on January 24, 2019 and Klara Neurauter on June 24, 2021.
For die Alternative list Innsbruck (3) Marco Frei was sworn in on June 14, 2018, Roland Steixner on September 17, 2018 and Irene Labner on December 13, 2018.
News from city politics in the political ticker of the Innsbruck district newspapers
city senate
There are also substitute members in the city senate. So are as substitute members in the city senate without office Christoph Appler, Janine Bex. Andrea Dengg, Christoph Kaufmann, Renate Krammer-Stark, Andreas Kunst and Benjamin Plach.
Who can run where?
keyword state election: A cross-district candidacy is possible here. The mayor of Kufstein, Martin Krumschnabel, is running for his wife Andrea’s family party in the 2018 state elections as the top candidate in Innsbruck. Legally, it looks like this: Election candidates who have the right to stand as a candidate (including Austrian citizens with their main residence in Tyrol) can be nominated for district election proposals regardless of where they live in Tyrol. For example, a person with their main residence in Innsbruck-Land can also run for office in Innsbruck-Stadt. Exception: However, it is not possible to run for office in two districts at the same time.
Special status Innsbruck
In all Tyrolean municipalities – with the exception of Innsbruck – municipal councils and substitute members automatically lose their seat on the municipal council as soon as they move their main residence to another municipality. A municipal council or a substitute municipality of Innsbruck that does not resign its mandate and does not take a leave of absence does not have to do so either. According to estimates by the responsible electoral authority, this is not necessary either, since the registration of residence on the key date is used for the municipal council election (Section 6 of the Innsbruck electoral regulations). A change of main residence during the government period is therefore no reason for losing the mandate. In the Innsbruck city law, the reasons for the end of the mandate are given in § 16 and 16a. The change of main residence in a municipality outside of Innsbruck during the term of office WILL NOT be listed there.
denial by the state government
Innsbruck city law stipulates that members of the municipal council who move their main residence from Innsbruck to another municipality and die cannot waive their mandate themselves, the state government can revoke their mandate. This step has never been necessary before. However, this does not apply to substitute municipal council members – there is no express provision in the law here. Substitute members can voluntarily renounce their mandate; as soon as a substitute member moves up to the municipal council, the above-mentioned legal regulation for members of the municipal council applies anyway. It remains to be seen whether municipal politics will address the issue as part of the next municipal law reform, until then the city of Innsbruck has a special status.
More news from Innsbruck can be found here